WA HB1315 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a preferred alternative for the placement, sale, and public notice of impounded livestock.
Title
Creating a preferred alternative for the placement, sale, and public notice of impounded livestock.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-01-31 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |