WA HB1313 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning rewards cards.
Title
Concerning rewards cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Consumer Protection & Business. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-12 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5654 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.