WA SB5654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning rewards cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning rewards cards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-07SenateFIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.

Same As/Similar To

HB1313 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback