WA HB1306 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning bond authorization training for school district boards of directors.
Title
Concerning bond authorization training for school district boards of directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Education. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |