WA HB1305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning notices of disqualification in courts of limited jurisdiction.
Title
Concerning notices of disqualification in courts of limited jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |