WA HB1299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extending collective bargaining rights to assistant attorneys general.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending collective bargaining rights to assistant attorneys general.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-01-29HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-29HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-29HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-28HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Same As/Similar To

SB5297 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-18 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback