WA HB1295 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Annexing areas used for agricultural fairs.
Title
Annexing areas used for agricultural fairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-07 | Chapter 402, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-07 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | ARED - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-05 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-04 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-04 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |