WA HB1274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the member requirement for bona fide charitable or nonprofit organizations.
Title
Concerning the member requirement for bona fide charitable or nonprofit organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-27 | House | Chapter 133, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-26 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2017-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
Same As/Similar To
SB5190 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.