WA HB1274 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing a value-based system for nursing home rates.
Title
Implementing a value-based system for nursing home rates.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Effective date 7/1/2015. |
2015-06-30 | House | Chapter 2, 2015 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2015-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-27 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-24 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-06-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB5152 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.