WA SB5152 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing a value-based system for nursing home rates.
Title
Implementing a value-based system for nursing home rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-06-24 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1274 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-30 - Effective date 7/1/2015.