WA HB1270 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting electronic signatures on applications for public assistance and for benefits administered by the health care authority.
Title
Permitting electronic signatures on applications for public assistance and for benefits administered by the health care authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Mary Dickerson [D] | Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] | Rep. Tami Green [D] |
Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Chapter 201, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-24 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-13 | President signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-30 | ELCS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-30 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-30 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5197 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.