WA HB1264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning secondary traumatic stress in public school staff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning secondary traumatic stress in public school staff.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2020-01-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-01-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-16SenateFloor amendment
2020-01-16SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-01-14SenatePlaced on third reading.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-09SenateExecutive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM failed.
2019-03-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-20SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-20SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-03-20SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-25HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-07HouseED - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback