WA HB1264 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning conservation districts' rates and charges.
Title
Concerning conservation districts' rates and charges.
Sponsors
Rep. James Wilcox [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5322 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1264&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1264.pdf |