WA SB5322 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning conservation districts' rates and charges.
Title
Concerning conservation districts' rates and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Chapter 88, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-03 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-03 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2015-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-19 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1264 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.