WA HB1249 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from prevailing wage requirements public works projects undertaken to repair fire damage.
Title
Exempting from prevailing wage requirements public works projects undertaken to repair fire damage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5619 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1249&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1249.pdf |