WA HB1244 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 5/19/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 5/19/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2009-2011 operating appropriations.
Title
Making 2009-2011 operating appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Effective date 5/19/2009. | |
2009-05-19 | Chapter 564, 2009 Laws PV. | |
2009-05-19 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-25 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-04-24 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-04-24 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-24 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-24 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-04-07 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-04-07 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-07 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-31 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5600 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.