WA HB1235 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain current higher education tuition-setting practices permanent.
Title
Making certain current higher education tuition-setting practices permanent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Higher Education. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-13 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-13 | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-13 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-13 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-06 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5734 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/26/2009.