WA HB1234 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing law enforcement crime prevention efforts regarding security alarm systems and crime watch programs for residential and commercial locations.
Title
Addressing law enforcement crime prevention efforts regarding security alarm systems and crime watch programs for residential and commercial locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-29 | Chapter 88, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-05 | President signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-16 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-16 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations, and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-17 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2012-01-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 8. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-18 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2011-02-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Floor amendment | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-11 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-09 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-09 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-09 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-31 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-17 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5244 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.