WA SB5244 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing law enforcement crime prevention efforts regarding security alarm systems and crime watch programs for residential and commercial locations.
Title
Addressing law enforcement crime prevention efforts regarding security alarm systems and crime watch programs for residential and commercial locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-01-13 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-01-12 | GO - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-12 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2011-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-15 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. | |
2011-02-07 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-19 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1234 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.