WA HB1228 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting industrial insurance benefits for injuries or diseases caused by use of intoxicating liquor or drugs.
Title
Limiting industrial insurance benefits for injuries or diseases caused by use of intoxicating liquor or drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1228&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1228.pdf |