WA HB1219 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning deficiency claims after auction of a private property vehicle impound.
Title
Concerning deficiency claims after auction of a private property vehicle impound.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-01 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB5016 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.