WA HB1213 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding accessible, affordable child care and early childhood development programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding accessible, affordable child care and early childhood development programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-24SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-24SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-24SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2021-03-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-03-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-09HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-09HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-03-09HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-03-09House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-17HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-03HouseCYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families.

Same As/Similar To

SB5237 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Conference committee report; received 10:30 AM 4/21/2021.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28b50248Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43216New CodeSee Bill Text
43216010Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43216075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216090Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
432161365Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43216505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216578Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216749Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43330New CodeSee Bill Text
4384092Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1213&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1213.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1213-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1213-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1213-S2.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20BOEH%20CLAJ%20182.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20SENN%20BROD%20065.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20DENT%20BROD%20090.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20DENT%20CLAJ%20188.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20ESLI%20BROD%20089.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20ESLI%20BROD%20091.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20MCCA%20BROD%20096.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20MCCA%20BROD%20098.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20STOK%20CLAJ%20187.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20YOUN%20BROD%20097.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1213-S2%20AMH%20YOUN%20BROD%20099.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1213-S2.E%20AMS%20EDU%20S2208.2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1213%20HBA%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1213%20HBR%20CYF%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1213%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1213-S2.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1213-S2.E%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1213-S2.E%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1213-S2.E%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123475&actionText=CYF%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28460&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123475&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28620&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123475&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1213&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123475&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28875&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback