WA HB1213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting the use of greywater in urban buildings.
Title
Promoting the use of greywater in urban buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 9:00 AM. |
2017-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |