WA HB1185 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing business practices that involve offering free or reduced-priced goods or services to the public not contingent on the purchase, continuation, or termination of insurance or the receipt of a quote for insurance, relative to the insurance code's prohibition on offering rebates or inducements to purchase insurance.
Title
Addressing business practices that involve offering free or reduced-priced goods or services to the public not contingent on the purchase, continuation, or termination of insurance or the receipt of a quote for insurance, relative to the insurance code's prohibition on offering rebates or inducements to purchase insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1185&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1185.pdf |