WA HB1180 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public testimony at public meetings, including virtual meetings.
Title
Concerning public testimony at public meetings, including virtual meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 30 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 30 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |