WA HB1153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning crimes against vulnerable persons.
Title
Concerning crimes against vulnerable persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-10 | House | Chapter 266, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-19 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Same As/Similar To
SB5099 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.