WA HB1126 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning department of early learning fatality reviews.
Title
Concerning department of early learning fatality reviews.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-08 | House | Chapter 199, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass ELHS 15 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services. |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-01-30 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-30 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 11:00 AM. |
2015-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |