WA HB1122 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting public safety through responsible storage of firearms.
Title
Protecting public safety through responsible storage of firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-18 | House | JUDI - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:00 PM. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5463 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.