WA HB1117 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the relinquishment of water rights.
Title
Regarding the relinquishment of water rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Sen. James McCune [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-12 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1117&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1117.pdf |