WA HB1109 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 5/21/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making 2019-2021 biennium operating appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making 2019-2021 biennium operating appropriations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseEffective date 5/21/2019*.
2019-05-21HouseChapter 415, 2019 Laws PV.
2019-05-21HouseGovernor partially vetoed.
2019-04-28HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-28HouseConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-28SenatePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-28SenateConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-27HouseConference committee report; received 3:30 PM 4/27/2019.
2019-04-27SenateConference committee report; received 3:15 PM 4/27/2019.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee appointed. Senators Braun, Frockt, Rolfes.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee request granted.
2019-04-26HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Ormsby, Robinson, Stokesbary.
2019-04-26HouseHouse refuses to concur in the Senate amendments. Asks Senate for Conference thereon.
2019-04-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-04SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-03SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-03SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-03SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-04-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-29HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-29HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2019-03-29HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-29House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading.
2019-03-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-27HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-01-10HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5153 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1109&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1109-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1109-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1109-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117447&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-29-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1109&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117447&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1109&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117447&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-28-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1109&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117447&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-28-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1109&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback