WA HB1104 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Environment.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Environment.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Incentivizing up-front environmental planning and review.
Title
Incentivizing up-front environmental planning and review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Environment. |
2014-01-13 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1104&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1104.pdf |