WA HB1086 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the state office of behavioral health consumer advocacy.
Title
Creating the state office of behavioral health consumer advocacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 202, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-01 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-17 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-27 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
71 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
71 | 24 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 350 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |