WA HB1085 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting a safe learning environment for students with seizure disorders.
Title
Promoting a safe learning environment for students with seizure disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Frank Chopp [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-14 | House | Chapter 29, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-15 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
SCHOOL DIRECTORS' ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON STATE
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SCHOOL DIRECTORS' ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON STATE
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 210 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 210 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 235 | New Code | See Bill Text |