WA HB1078 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning urban forest management ordinances.
Title
Concerning urban forest management ordinances.
Sponsors
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-01 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-03 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
76 | 15 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |