WA HB1077 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding aquatic lands lease rates for marinas.
Title
Regarding aquatic lands lease rates for marinas.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Alexander [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Sen. James McCune [R] | Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Daniel Roach [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-02-20 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-20 | EPAR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | EPAR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ecology & Parks at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Ecology & Parks. | |
2009-01-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5255 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.