WA HB1073 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding coverage of the paid family and medical leave program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding coverage of the paid family and medical leave program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-16SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-13HousePassed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-07SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-17SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-17SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-17SenateLCTA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs.
2021-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-03HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-03HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-03-03House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-18HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-05HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-05HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2021-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50a05010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50a15010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50a35010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50a35020Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1073&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1073.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1073-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1073-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1073-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1073-S2.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1073-S2%20AMH%20DUFA%20SMIL%20143.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1073-S2%20AMH%20HOFF%20SMIL%20130.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1073-S2%20AMH%20HOFF%20SMIL%20131.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1073-S2.E%20AMS%20LCTA%20S2092.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1073-S2.E%20AMS%20WM%20S2292.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1073%20HBA%20LAWS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1073%20HBR%20LAWS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1073%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1073-S2.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1073-S2.E%20SBA%20LCTA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1073-S2.E%20SBR%20LCTA%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1073-S2.E%20SBR%20LCTA%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1073-S2.E%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1073-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1073-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1073-S2.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1073-S2.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1073-S2.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123134&actionText=LAWS%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28464&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123134&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28691&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123134&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1073&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123134&actionText=LCTA%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28850&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123134&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28996&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123134&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1073&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123134&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-13-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1073&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback