WA HB1071 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning bias-based criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning bias-based criminal offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
994a411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a535Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback