WA HB1034 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a soju endorsement to certain restaurant licenses.
Title
Establishing a soju endorsement to certain restaurant licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 61, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-29 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2018-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5020 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.