WA HB1024 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing cities and counties to facilitate the maintenance and repair of private roadways impacting the public interest.
Title
Authorizing cities and counties to facilitate the maintenance and repair of private roadways impacting the public interest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1024&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1024.pdf |