WA HB1018 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying when a special election may be held.
Title
Modifying when a special election may be held.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-23 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Effective date 7/26/2009*. | |
2009-05-08 | Chapter 413, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-08 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-25 | President signed. | |
2009-04-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-24 | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-04-24 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-23 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-23 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-23 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-20 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-05 | SGTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-05 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-05 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5016 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.