WA HB1014 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning capital projects for the provision of fire protection services.
Title
Concerning capital projects for the provision of fire protection services.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Abbarno [R] | Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] |
Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Mark Klicker [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Greg Cheney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2022-12-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | New Code | See Bill Text |