WA HB1011 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the use of gender-segregated facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the use of gender-segregated facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2016-12-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback