WA HB1003 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing energy efficiency standards for consumer products.
Title
Establishing energy efficiency standards for consumer products.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-17 | EWE - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. | |
2011-02-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-07 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-02 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-02 | TEC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. | |
2011-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |