WA HB1001 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Funding education first.
Title
Funding education first.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Linda Kochmar [R] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1001&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1001.pdf |