WA HB1001 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Placing restrictions on pro se defendants when questioning witnesses.
Title
Placing restrictions on pro se defendants when questioning witnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-02-23 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2011-02-22 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-15 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-20 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-01-20 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-01-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-12-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |