VT S0297 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Rep. Grad of Moretown moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Rep. Grad of Moretown moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Recording Of Custodial Interrogations In Homicide And Sexual Assault Cases
Title
An Act Relating To The Recording Of Custodial Interrogations In Homicide And Sexual Assault Cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Rep. Grad of Moretown moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to. |
2014-02-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Motion to amend bill agreed to |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Benning |
2014-02-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |