VT S0272 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Corrections and Institutions which was agreed to.
Pending: House Corrections and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Corrections and Institutions which was agreed to.
Pending: House Corrections and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Detention Of Public Inebriates
Title
An Act Relating To Detention Of Public Inebriates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Corrections and Institutions which was agreed to. |
2014-01-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-01-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |