VT S0259 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to climate change cost recovery
Title
An act relating to climate change cost recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Passed on roll call, requested by Senator Watson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Watson, Passed -- Needed 13 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 5 (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Watson, Passed -- Needed 13 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 5 (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-26 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-04-24 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Sheldon of Middlebury moved to commit bill to the Committee on Judiciary, which was agreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-04-22 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-04-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-04-04 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Passed on roll call, requested by Senator Watson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Sears and Kitchel |
2024-04-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Watson, Passed -- Needed 13 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 5 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to on Roll Call 21-Y, 5-N |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Finance |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hashim for Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |