VT S0247 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Ordered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Cordes of Lincoln
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Ordered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Cordes of Lincoln
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prohibiting discrimination based on genetic information
Title
An act relating to prohibiting discrimination based on genetic information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Ordered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Cordes of Lincoln |
2022-04-27 | House | Rep. Cordes of Lincoln moved to postpone action until May 3rd, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-04-27 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-21 | House | Rep. Cordes of Lincoln moved to postpone action until April 27, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-04-21 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to postpone action until April 21, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-04-13 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-12 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-22 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Finance |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |