VT S0232 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to implementing the expansion of juvenile jurisdiction
Title
An act relating to implementing the expansion of juvenile jurisdiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020 |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor on July 1, 2020 |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 30, 2020 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-26 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-06-26 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-06-26 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-26 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-06-26 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-25 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2020-06-25 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-25 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2020-06-24 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-06-24 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2020-06-24 | House | Rep. Tully of Rockingham reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2020-06-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-06-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |